Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/02/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/08/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/09/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/16/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 11/16/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/16/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/16/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/18/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/16/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/16/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/28/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew