Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/18/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/18/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/12/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/15/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/16/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/07/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/08/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/14/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/06/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/22/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/28/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2006