Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/20/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/20/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/20/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/20/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/09/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/07/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/01/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/01/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/17/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/13/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2006