Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/18/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/23/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/29/2006