Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/19/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/10/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/10/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/10/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/10/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/16/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/13/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/16/2005