Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/29/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/19/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/19/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew