Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/25/2006