Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/26/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/27/2005