Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/07/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/07/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/07/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 12/07/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/31/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/14/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/13/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/13/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/30/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/30/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/04/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/05/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/06/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/15/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/15/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/28/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/21/2006