Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/13/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/14/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/22/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/28/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/09/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/15/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/28/2006