Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 09/13/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/14/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/14/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/22/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/29/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/03/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/03/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/18/2005