Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/2006