Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/16/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/02/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/16/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/28/2006