Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/22/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/22/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/22/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/26/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/29/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/08/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/13/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/20/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/20/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/17/2005