Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/28/2006