Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/27/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/04/2005