Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/18/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/14/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2006