Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/29/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/29/2005