Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/11/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/15/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/12/2006