Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/27/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/29/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/29/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew