Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/19/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/20/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/25/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/25/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/25/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/26/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/06/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/06/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2005