Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/20/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/21/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/13/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/18/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/18/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/18/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/20/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/26/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/04/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/18/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/06/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/08/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/01/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/01/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/08/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/13/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/13/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/13/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/15/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/28/2006