Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/02/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/02/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/02/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/02/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/02/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/02/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/02/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/02/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/09/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/09/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/09/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/14/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/14/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/14/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/14/2005