Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/21/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/21/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/15/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/22/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/25/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/31/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/06/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/14/2006