Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/02/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/07/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/08/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/10/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/29/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/01/2005