Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/21/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/21/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 06/21/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/23/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/23/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/03/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/27/2006