Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/12/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/12/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/12/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/12/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/12/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/19/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/25/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/10/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/07/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/06/2006