Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/16/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/17/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/23/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/07/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/05/2006