Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/06/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/14/2005