Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/09/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/27/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/18/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/03/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006