Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/08/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/19/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/06/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/20/2006