Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/30/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/24/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/24/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/06/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/13/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/14/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/19/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/19/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/19/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/20/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/20/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2006