Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/14/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/07/2006