Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/11/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/22/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/29/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/20/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/27/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/08/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/06/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/14/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/15/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/16/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/18/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/06/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew