Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2006