Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/13/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/13/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/05/2006