Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/18/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/21/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/21/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/06/2006