Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/17/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/17/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/29/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/29/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/30/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/19/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/28/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/16/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/28/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2006