Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/28/2006