Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/11/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/22/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/22/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/24/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/24/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/01/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew