Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/11/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/29/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/18/2005