Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/18/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/29/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006