Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/05/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/18/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/19/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/06/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/06/2006