Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 05/18/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/18/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/27/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/27/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/29/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/06/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/20/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/28/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/28/2006