Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/17/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/17/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/17/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/17/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/17/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/17/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/01/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/02/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/02/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/02/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/02/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/03/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/03/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/09/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/10/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/14/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/15/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/17/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/20/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/20/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/11/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/11/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/16/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/24/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/13/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew