Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/04/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/04/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/24/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/24/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/24/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2006