Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/24/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/20/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/14/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/18/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/18/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/21/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/26/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/20/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/08/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/07/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/14/2005