Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/06/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006