Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/07/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/03/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/23/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2006