Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/12/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/14/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/21/2006